INEOS AUTOMOTIVE LIMITED v. JAGUAR LAND ROVER LIMITED et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Michael E Farbiarz |
Referred: | James B Clark |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-13174 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:44 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jun 30, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 16, 2022 6:20 PM EST |
Defendant
JAGUAR LAND ROVER LIMITED
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Notice Only
KATHERINE M. BASTIAN
|
|
Notice Only
DAVID DONAHUE
|
|
Notice Only
JESSICA L. ELLSWORTH
|
|
Notice Only
HARRISON GRAY KILGORE
|
|
Notice Only
PHV DANIEL M. NUZZACI
|
|
Notice Only
LAURA POPP-ROSENBERG
|
|
Notice Only
BRENDAN C. QUINN
|
|
Notice Only
PHV ANNA KURIAN SHAW
|
|
Plaintiff
INEOS AUTOMOTIVE LIMITED
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, February 28, 2024 | ||
71 | 71
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 02/28 5:05 PM
LETTER ORDER granting70 Defendant's request for an extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's pre-motion letter, until 4/30/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 2/28/2024. (jd, ) |
|
70 | 70
misc
Letter
Wed 02/28 12:59 PM
Letter from Jason M. Russell requesting a further extension, until April 30, 2024, to respond to Plaintiff's pre-motion letter requesting permission to file a motion to compel re61 Letter. (RUSSELL, JASON) |